This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/29/2021 at 03:53:25 (UTC).

CITY OF EL MONTE, A CALIFORNIA MUNICIPAL CORPORATION VS MIDWAY PLAZA, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/14/2021 CITY OF EL MONTE, A CALIFORNIA MUNICIPAL CORPORATION filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against MIDWAY PLAZA, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5885

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF EL MONTE A CALIFORNIA MUNICIPAL CORPORATION

Defendants

EAST WEST BANK A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

MIDWAY PLAZA LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

IMOISILI ALUYAH I.

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

7/15/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/15/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/14/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/14/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

7/14/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2021
  • Hearing10/27/2021 at 10:15 AM in Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • Hearing09/28/2021 at 11:30 AM in Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by CITY OF EL MONTE, a California municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by CITY OF EL MONTE, a California municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF EL MONTE is a litigant

Latest cases where EAST WEST BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer IMOISILI ALUYAH