This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/21/2021 at 04:09:14 (UTC).

CITY OF EL MONTE, A CALIFORNIA MUNICIPAL CORPORATION VS DAN TU CUN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/07/2021 CITY OF EL MONTE, A CALIFORNIA MUNICIPAL CORPORATION filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against DAN TU CUN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PETER A. HERNANDEZ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0471

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PETER A. HERNANDEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF EL MONTE A CALIFORNIA MUNICIPAL CORPORATION

Defendants

CUN DAN TU

EAGLE HOME MORTGAGE LLC A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

ZOU JIAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

IMOISILI ALUYAH

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/23/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/7/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

6/7/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/7/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

6/8/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/8/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2021
  • Hearing10/18/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department O at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • Hearing10/18/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department O at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by CITY OF EL MONTE, a California municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by CITY OF EL MONTE, a California municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by CITY OF EL MONTE, a California municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Eagle Home Mortgage LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF EL MONTE is a litigant