This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/28/2021 at 04:11:14 (UTC).

CITY OF EL MONTE, A CALIFORNIA MUNICIPAL CORPORATION VS CROWN ESTATE HOLDING, LLC., A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/15/2021 CITY OF EL MONTE, A CALIFORNIA MUNICIPAL CORPORATION filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CROWN ESTATE HOLDING, LLC , A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CURTIS A. KIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6110

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CURTIS A. KIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CITY OF EL MONTE A CALIFORNIA MUNICIPAL CORPORATION

CITY OF EL MONTE

Defendants

CROWN ESTATE HOLDING LLC. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

HOOPER JAY

CROWN ESTATE HOLDING LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEMIEUX ALEXANDER P.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/15/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/15/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/3/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

8/3/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/9/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/9/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILUR...)

9/13/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILUR...)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2021
  • Hearing12/06/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 72 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 72, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (as to defendants Crown Estate Holding, LLC and Jay Hooper) - Held - Advanced and Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 72, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Order to Show Cause Re: Failur...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by City of El Monte (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by City of El Monte (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by City of El Monte (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by City of El Monte (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by City of El Monte (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CROWN ESTATE HOLDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF EL MONTE is a litigant