This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/15/2023 at 03:48:57 (UTC).

CITY OF CULVER CITY, A CHARTER CITY VS WESTSIDE KUSH CANNABIS DISPENSARY, A BUSINESS ENTITY, FORM UNKNOWN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/06/2022 CITY OF CULVER CITY, A CHARTER CITY filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against WESTSIDE KUSH CANNABIS DISPENSARY, A BUSINESS ENTITY, FORM UNKNOWN,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Beverly Hills Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EDWARD B. MORETON, JR.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2553

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

EDWARD B. MORETON, JR.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF CULVER CITY A CHARTER CITY

Defendants

SELDON JUDY A.

SELDON STEVEN M.

WESTSIDE KUSH CANNABIS DISPENSARY A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM UNKNOWN

JUDY SELDON AS TRUSTEE OF THE SELDON FAMILY TRUST

STEVEN SELDON AS TRUSTEE OF THE SELDON FAMILY TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CASTILLO CAROLINE

 

Court Documents

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

2/10/2023: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

2/10/2023: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

1/26/2023: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

1/25/2023: Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION)

1/20/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/20/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

1/13/2023: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

12/19/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

12/9/2022: Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

Proof of Personal Service

12/9/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/9/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/9/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING O...)

12/9/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING O...)

Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

12/9/2022: Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

12/8/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

Request for Judicial Notice

12/7/2022: Request for Judicial Notice

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

12/7/2022: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF CAROLINE K CASTILLO RE EXPARTE NOTICE

12/7/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF CAROLINE K CASTILLO RE EXPARTE NOTICE

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2023
  • Hearing06/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 205 at 9355 Burton Way, Beverly Hills, CA 90210; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: City of Culver City, a charter city (Plaintiff); As to: Steven Seldon, as trustee of the Seldon Family Trust dated September 29, 2000 (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: City of Culver City, a charter city (Plaintiff); As to: Judy Seldon, as trustee of the Seldon Family Trust dated September 29, 2000 (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketOrder [PROPOSED] ORDER FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; Signed and Filed by: City of Culver City, a charter city (Plaintiff); As to: Westside Kush Cannabis Dispensary, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: City of Culver City, a charter city (Plaintiff); As to: Westside Kush Cannabis Dispensary, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • Docket; Default not entered as to Westside Kush Cannabis Dispensary, a business entity, form unknown; On the Complaint filed by City of Culver City, a charter city on 12/06/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Preliminary Injunction)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Preliminary Injunction scheduled for 01/20/2023 at 09:00 AM in Beverly Hills Courthouse at Department 205 updated: Result Date to 01/20/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketNotice Notice of Case Reassignment; Filed by: City of Culver City, a charter city (Plaintiff); As to: Steven M. Seldon (Defendant); Judy A. Seldon (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketDeclaration OF CAROLINE K CASTILLO RE EXPARTE NOTICE; Filed by: City of Culver City, a charter city (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketHearing on Ex Parte Application FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION scheduled for 12/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Beverly Hills Courthouse at Department 200

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Beverly Hills Courthouse at Department 200

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: City of Culver City, a charter city (Plaintiff); As to: Westside Kush Cannabis Dispensary, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant); Steven M. Seldon (Defendant); Judy A. Seldon (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: City of Culver City, a charter city (Plaintiff); As to: Westside Kush Cannabis Dispensary, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant); Steven M. Seldon (Defendant); Judy A. Seldon (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: City of Culver City, a charter city (Plaintiff); As to: Westside Kush Cannabis Dispensary, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant); Steven M. Seldon (Defendant); Judy A. Seldon (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Edward B. Moreton, Jr. in Department 200 Beverly Hills Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less