Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/08/2021 at 10:45:02 (UTC).

CITY OF BEVERLY HILLS VS WITHAM, MICHAEL GREGORY

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 CITY OF BEVERLY HILLS filed a Labor - Workplace Violence lawsuit against WITHAM, MICHAEL GREGORY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SWIFT, DAVID W.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1810

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Workplace Violence

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SWIFT, DAVID W.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CITY OF BEVERLY HILLS

Respondent

WITHAM MICHAEL GREGORY

Other

YI CHAE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BAKALY CHARLES GEORGE IV

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

5/10/2021: Minute Order

Proof of Service - WV109,WV110,WV100

4/21/2021: Proof of Service - WV109,WV110,WV100

Petition - Workplace Violence

4/16/2021: Petition - Workplace Violence

Civil Case Cover Sheet - And Addendum

4/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - And Addendum

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - All Granted

4/16/2021: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - All Granted

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

4/16/2021: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2021
  • Hearing06/14/2021 at 8:30 AM in Department 25 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Restraining Order Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 25, Swift, David W., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (WV109,WV110,WV100 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (And Addendum )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketPetition - Workplace Violence; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110) (All Granted ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF BEVERLY HILLS is a litigant