This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/19/2023 at 11:42:51 (UTC).

CITY OF BELL GARDENS, A CALIFORNIA MUNICIPAL CORPORATION VS BELL GARDENS HOSPITALITY, LLC., A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/22/2020 CITY OF BELL GARDENS, A CALIFORNIA MUNICIPAL CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BELL GARDENS HOSPITALITY, LLC , A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SAMANTHA JESSNER and DENNIS J. LANDIN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5440

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

SAMANTHA JESSNER

DENNIS J. LANDIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

CITY OF BELL GARDENS A CALIFORNIA MUNICIPAL CORPORATION

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

BELL GARDENS HOSPITALITY LLC. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Not Classified By Court

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LITFIN TODD

Defendant Attorney

BOURKE THOMAS

Cross Defendant Attorney

LARSEN JOSEPH

Not Classified By Court Attorney

MILLER LOUIS

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/22/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

4/22/2020: Complaint

Request for Dismissal

10/8/2020: Request for Dismissal

Answer - ANSWER TO COUNTER-CLAIMANT

6/26/2020: Answer - ANSWER TO COUNTER-CLAIMANT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

6/26/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 06/26/2020

6/26/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 06/26/2020

Substitution of Attorney

6/5/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Notice of Related Case

5/20/2020: Notice of Related Case

Cross-Complaint - CROSS-COMPLAINT COUNTERCLAIM

5/19/2020: Cross-Complaint - CROSS-COMPLAINT COUNTERCLAIM

Response - RESPONSE NON-PARTY COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF CITY OF BELL GARDENS OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

5/11/2020: Response - RESPONSE NON-PARTY COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF CITY OF BELL GARDENS OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

Declaration - DECLARATION OF SEJAL SHAH

5/4/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF SEJAL SHAH

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5/4/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION OF DEFENDANT BELL GARDENS HOSPITALITY, LLC TO PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR TRO

5/4/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION OF DEFENDANT BELL GARDENS HOSPITALITY, LLC TO PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR TRO

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ERIKA OTERO

5/4/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ERIKA OTERO

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF NITIN MODY

5/4/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF NITIN MODY

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF YOUNGSUN PARK, ESQ.

5/4/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF YOUNGSUN PARK, ESQ.

Declaration - DECLARATION OF THOMAS M. MADRUGA IN SUPPORT OF CITY OF BELL GARDENS REQUEST TO CONTINUE EX PARTE HEARINGS OF MAY 5, 2020

5/5/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF THOMAS M. MADRUGA IN SUPPORT OF CITY OF BELL GARDENS REQUEST TO CONTINUE EX PARTE HEARINGS OF MAY 5, 2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF, CITY OF BELL GARDENS, FOR ...)

5/5/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF, CITY OF BELL GARDENS, FOR ...)

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by City of Bell Gardens, a California municipal corporation on 04/22/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by City of Bell Gardens, a California municipal corporation as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 11/04/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 51 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/09/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Related Case: Status Date changed from 05/20/2020 to 05/20/2020; Filed By: Bell Gardens Hospitality, LLC., a California limited liability company (Defendant); Result: Denied; Result Date: 06/26/2020; As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketAnswer TO COUNTER-CLAIMANT; Filed by: City of Bell Gardens, a California municipal corporation (Cross-Defendant); As to: Bell Gardens Hospitality, LLC., a California limited liability company (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re Notice of Related Case)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re Notice of Related Case) of 06/26/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by: City of Bell Gardens, a California municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Thomas Bourke (Attorney): Organization Name changed from Law Offices of Thomas K. Bourke to Law Office of Thomas K. Bourke; Middle Name: blank

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint Counterclaim; Filed by: Bell Gardens Hospitality, LLC., a California limited liability company (Defendant); As to: City of Bell Gardens, a California municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketResponse Non-Party County of Los Angeles? Response to Plaintiff City of Bell Gardens? Opposition to Notice of Related Case; Filed by: County of Los Angeles (Non-Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketDeclaration of Sejal Shah; Filed by: Bell Gardens Hospitality, LLC., a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Filed by: County of Los Angeles (Non-Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Related Case: Status Date changed from 05/01/2020 to 05/01/2020; As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 11/04/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 51

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Dennis J. Landin in Department 51 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: City of Bell Gardens, a California municipal corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Bell Gardens Hospitality, LLC., a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: City of Bell Gardens, a California municipal corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Bell Gardens Hospitality, LLC., a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: City of Bell Gardens, a California municipal corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Bell Gardens Hospitality, LLC., a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less