Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/21/2021 at 03:46:13 (UTC).

CITY NATIONAL BANK VS VICTOR MURGATROYD

Case Summary

On 03/03/2021 CITY NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against VICTOR MURGATROYD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0416

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY NATIONAL BANK

Defendant

MURGATROYD VICTOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRIEDMAN JOSHUA P

 

Court Documents

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/15/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/3/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

3/3/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/3/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/3/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/4/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2021
  • Hearing09/09/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by City National Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by City National Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by City National Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY NATIONAL BANK is a litigant