Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/22/2021 at 14:12:31 (UTC).

CITY NATIONAL BANK VS SUSANNA STAR

Case Summary

On 04/19/2021 CITY NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SUSANNA STAR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0375

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Burbank Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY NATIONAL BANK

Defendant

STAR SUSANNA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRIEDMAN JOSHUA P

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/19/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/19/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/19/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

4/19/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/19/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

4/19/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2021
  • Hearing09/13/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • Hearing06/29/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by City National Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by City National Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by City National Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY NATIONAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FRIEDMAN JOSHUA P