This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 at 08:50:01 (UTC).

CITY NATIONAL BANK NA VS STEPHEN DORFF ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/08/2017 CITY NATIONAL BANK NA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against STEPHEN DORFF. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2865

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CITY NATIONAL BANK N.A.

Defendants and Respondents

LA COSTA PRODUCTIONS

DORFF STEPHEN

DOES 1 TO 50

FREDONICK LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

YOO S. CHRISTOPHER ESQ.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

3/8/2017: SUMMONS

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

3/14/2017: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

3/17/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

3/17/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER

4/7/2017: NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER

Unknown

4/21/2017: Unknown

NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE

4/24/2017: NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown

4/24/2017: Unknown

Unknown

4/24/2017: Unknown

STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL; AND ORDER THEREON

4/25/2017: STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL; AND ORDER THEREON

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL

5/1/2017: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2017
  • Notice (OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING STIP FOR DISMISSAL ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • Stipulation and Order (STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL; AND ORDER THEREON u.s. mail) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • Notice of Status Conference filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • Ntc and Acknowledgement of Receipt (AS TO: La Costa Productions ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • Receipt (FIRST APPEARANCE FEE $1305.00 Dorff, stephen La Costa Productions Fredonick, LLC) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • Notice of Status Conference filed Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons (AS TO: Fredonick, LLC Dorff, stephen ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY NATIONAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YOO S. CHRISTOPHER