This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/10/2023 at 07:21:48 (UTC).

CITY ELECTRIC SUPPLY, A FLORIDA CORPORATION VS WESTERN NATIONAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, A SURETY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/15/2022 CITY ELECTRIC SUPPLY, A FLORIDA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against WESTERN NATIONAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, A SURETY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are OLIVIA ROSALES and RUPERT A. BYRDSONG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0250

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

OLIVIA ROSALES

RUPERT A. BYRDSONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY ELECTRIC SUPPLY A FLORIDA CORPORATION

Defendants

CITY OF PICO RIVERA A PUBLIC ENTITY

GA TECHNICAL SERVICES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

WESTERN NATIONAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY A SURETY

WESTERN SURETY COMPANY A SURETY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LLOYD JENNIFER R.

Defendant Attorneys

CHANG RYAN

CHING AUSTIN ALAN

OWENS STEPHEN T.

ZANIN ANGELA

HOWARD ELMIRA R.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/28/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

8/25/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

8/18/2023: Case Management Statement

Answer

8/17/2023: Answer

Notice of Continuance - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/1/2023: Notice of Continuance - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/28/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER REGARDING NOTICE OF RELATED CASE;)

5/19/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER REGARDING NOTICE OF RELATED CASE;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER REGARDING NOTICE OF RELATED CASE;) OF 05/19/2023

5/19/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER REGARDING NOTICE OF RELATED CASE;) OF 05/19/2023

Case Management Statement

5/9/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

5/8/2023: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY SANCT...)

2/22/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY SANCT...)

Notice of Change of Firm Name - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME, CONTACT INFORMATION, AND ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

2/21/2023: Notice of Change of Firm Name - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME, CONTACT INFORMATION, AND ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

Notice of Ruling

1/26/2023: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/13/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 01/13/2023

1/13/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 01/13/2023

Notice of Related Case

1/4/2023: Notice of Related Case

Answer

12/23/2022: Answer

Case Management Statement

11/30/2022: Case Management Statement

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2024
  • Hearing02/09/2024 at 1:30 PM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 02/09/2024 at 01:30 PM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2023
  • DocketPursuant to oral stipulation, Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/28/2023 at 01:30 PM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F Held - Continued was rescheduled to 02/09/2024 01:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Minute Order (Case Management Conference): Status Date changed from 08/28/2023 to 08/28/2023 ; Name Extension changed from (Case Management Conference) to (Case Management Conference) ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: CITY ELECTRIC SUPPLY, a Florida Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: WESTERN SURETY COMPANY, a surety (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: WESTERN SURETY COMPANY, a surety (Defendant); As to: CITY ELECTRIC SUPPLY, a Florida Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2023
  • DocketNotice of Continuance of Case Management Conference; Filed by: CITY ELECTRIC SUPPLY, a Florida Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 08/28/2023 at 01:30 PM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketAddress for Jennifer R. Lloyd (Attorney) null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Rupert A. Byrdsong in Department 28 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: CITY ELECTRIC SUPPLY, a Florida Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: WESTERN NATIONAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, a surety (Defendant); CITY OF PICO RIVERA a public entity (Defendant); GA TECHNICAL SERVICES, INC., a California corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CITY ELECTRIC SUPPLY, a Florida Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: WESTERN NATIONAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, a surety (Defendant); CITY OF PICO RIVERA a public entity (Defendant); GA TECHNICAL SERVICES, INC., a California corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CITY ELECTRIC SUPPLY, a Florida Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: WESTERN NATIONAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, a surety (Defendant); CITY OF PICO RIVERA a public entity (Defendant); GA TECHNICAL SERVICES, INC., a California corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less