This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/28/2021 at 09:52:22 (UTC).

CITIZENS OF SAN FERNANDO COMMITTEE FOR ENVIRONMENTAL JUSTICE, AN UNICORPORATED ASSOCIATION VS CITY OF SAN FERNANDO, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 12/29/2020 CITIZENS OF SAN FERNANDO COMMITTEE FOR ENVIRONMENTAL JUSTICE, AN UNICORPORATED ASSOCIATION filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against CITY OF SAN FERNANDO, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID J. COWAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4258

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID J. COWAN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CITIZENS OF SAN FERNANDO COMMITTEE FOR ENVIRONMENTAL JUSTICE AN UNICORPORATED ASSOCIATION

Defendant and Respondent

CITY OF SAN FERNANDO A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

OVERING MICHAEL S.

WILDE EDWARD C.

Respondent Attorneys

BARR COLIN EDWARD

CAMPION MICHAEL DALY

 

Court Documents

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

9/9/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE WHY SANCTIONS IN THE SUM OF $250.00 SH...)

8/24/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE WHY SANCTIONS IN THE SUM OF $250.00 SH...)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHAEL CAMPION IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SANCTIONS

8/20/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHAEL CAMPION IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SANCTIONS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

7/20/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUED TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

5/21/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUED TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

5/20/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE CITIZENS OF SAN FERNANDO COMMITTEE FOR ENVIRONMENTAL JUSTICE REQUEST FOR CEQA ADMINISTRATIVE RECORDS TO THE CITY OF SAN FERNANDO

5/3/2021: Notice - NOTICE CITIZENS OF SAN FERNANDO COMMITTEE FOR ENVIRONMENTAL JUSTICE REQUEST FOR CEQA ADMINISTRATIVE RECORDS TO THE CITY OF SAN FERNANDO

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

4/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Answer

2/1/2021: Answer

Notice of Ruling

1/22/2021: Notice of Ruling

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF MICHAEL S. OVERING IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION AND A

1/5/2021: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF MICHAEL S. OVERING IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION AND A

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

1/5/2021: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION DECLARATION OF ALLISON M. LEE RE: NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION AND APPLICATION FOR IMMEDIATE TEMPORARY

1/5/2021: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION DECLARATION OF ALLISON M. LEE RE: NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION AND APPLICATION FOR IMMEDIATE TEMPORARY

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

1/5/2021: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

1/5/2021: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

1/5/2021: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

Notice - NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

1/6/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2021
  • Hearing10/19/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 82 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 82; Order to Show Cause Re: (SANCTIONS AGAINST RESPONDENT FOR FAILURE TO ATTEND 7/20/21 TSC) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 82; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE WHY SANCTIONS IN THE SUM OF $250.00 SH...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Michael Campion in Response to Order to Show Cause re Sanctions); Filed by City of San Fernando, a Municipal Corporation (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 82; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Continued Trial Setting Conference); Filed by Citizens of San Fernando Committee for Environmental Justice, an unicorporated association (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 82; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketOpposition (TO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR IMMEDIATE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF RICHARD PADILLA); Filed by City of San Fernando, a Municipal Corporation (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • Docketat 10:34 AM in Department 1, David J. Cowan, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re CEQA Case Assignment) of 12/31/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re CEQA Case Assignment)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketNotice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Citizens of San Fernando Committee for Environmental Justice, an unicorporated association (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by Citizens of San Fernando Committee for Environmental Justice, an unicorporated association (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Citizens of San Fernando Committee for Environmental Justice, an unicorporated association (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Petition); Filed by Citizens of San Fernando Committee for Environmental Justice, an unicorporated association (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketPetition for Writ of Mandate; Filed by Citizens of San Fernando Committee for Environmental Justice, an unicorporated association (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF SAN FERNANDO is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILDE EDWARD CHARLES

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OVERING MICHAEL STEVEN