This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/09/2022 at 10:49:02 (UTC).

CITIZENS OF HUMANITY, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION VS TAYPA TEKSTIL GIYIM SAN.VE. TIC.A.S. A TURKEY CORPORATION,

Case Summary

On 08/26/2022 CITIZENS OF HUMANITY, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TAYPA TEKSTIL GIYIM SAN VE TIC A S A TURKEY CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7882

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIZENS OF HUMANITY LLC

Defendant

TAYPA TEKSTIL GIYIM SAN.VE. TIC.A.S. A TURKEY CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ROSS PETER WAYNE

SCHWARTZ RICHARD A.

 

Court Documents

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

8/29/2022: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/29/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/29/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Complaint

8/26/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/26/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/26/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

8/26/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

8/26/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

8/26/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Proof of Service - No Service

10/24/2022: Proof of Service - No Service

Request for Dismissal

11/16/2022: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 12/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/23/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketOn the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by Citizens of Humanity, LLC on 08/29/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Citizens of Humanity, LLC as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Citizens of Humanity, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service; Filed by: Citizens of Humanity, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: TAYPA TEKSTIL GIYIM SAN.VE. TIC.A.S. a Turkey corporation, (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketAmended Complaint (1st); Filed by: Citizens of Humanity, LLC, a California limited liability corporation (Plaintiff); As to: TAYPA TEKSTIL GIYIM SAN.VE. TIC.A.S. a Turkey corporation, (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Peter Wayne Ross (Attorney): Organization Name changed from ROSS LLP to Ross LLP; Middle Name changed from W. to Wayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Citizens of Humanity, LLC, a California limited liability corporation (Plaintiff); As to: TAYPA TEKSTIL GIYIM SAN.VE. TIC.A.S. a Turkey corporation, (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 12/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Citizens of Humanity, LLC, a California limited liability corporation (Plaintiff); As to: TAYPA TEKSTIL GIYIM SAN.VE. TIC.A.S. a Turkey corporation, (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Citizens of Humanity, LLC, a California limited liability corporation (Plaintiff); As to: TAYPA TEKSTIL GIYIM SAN.VE. TIC.A.S. a Turkey corporation, (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Rupert A. Byrdsong in Department 28 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Citizens of Humanity, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSS PETER W. ESQ