This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/25/2023 at 05:29:15 (UTC).

CITIZENS BUSINESS BANK, A CALIFORNIA STATE-CHARTERED BANK VS DR. SANDHU ANIMAL HOSPITAL, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/18/2022 CITIZENS BUSINESS BANK, A CALIFORNIA STATE-CHARTERED BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DR SANDHU ANIMAL HOSPITAL, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN MORGAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0960

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN MORGAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIZENS BUSINESS BANK A CALIFORNIA STATE-CHARTERED BANK

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

DR. SANDHU ANIMAL HOSPITAL INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

SANDHU BALPAL AKA BALPAL S. SANDHU

Cross Defendants

DHILLON RANJIT SINGH

SINGH CHANJARIT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MIRMAN ALAN M.

NOSKIN SCOTT H.

Defendant Attorney

DOMINGUEZ DARIN

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/18/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

11/18/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/18/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/18/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Related Case

11/30/2022: Notice of Related Case

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 12/06/2022

12/6/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 12/06/2022

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 12/06/2022

12/6/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 12/06/2022

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/28/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/28/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Cross-Complaint

2/9/2023: Cross-Complaint

Answer

2/9/2023: Answer

Case Management Statement

3/13/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice of Continuance

3/13/2023: Notice of Continuance

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2023
  • Hearing08/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Dr. Sandhu Animal Hospital, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Balpal Sandhu (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketNotice of Continuance; Filed by: Citizens Business Bank, a California state-chartered bank (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketOver the objection of plaintiff, Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A14 Not Held - Rescheduled by Party was rescheduled to 08/28/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Cross-Complaint: As To Parties changed from RANJIT SINGH DHILLON (Cross-Defendant), CHANJARIT SINGH (Cross-Defendant) to CHANJARIT SINGH (Cross-Defendant), RANJIT SINGH DHILLON (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Dr. Sandhu Animal Hospital, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Balpal Sandhu (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: Dr. Sandhu Animal Hospital, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Balpal Sandhu (Defendant); As to: RANJIT SINGH DHILLON (Cross-Defendant); CHANJARIT SINGH (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Citizens Business Bank, a California state-chartered bank (Plaintiff); As to: Dr. Sandhu Animal Hospital, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/12/2022; Service Cost: 135.20; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Citizens Business Bank, a California state-chartered bank (Plaintiff); As to: Balpal Sandhu (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/12/2022; Service Cost: 165.20; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Related Case: Filed By: Citizens Business Bank, a California state-chartered bank (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 12/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketCase numbers 22AVCV00960, 22AVCV00959 are related; case number 22AVCV00959 is the lead case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A15 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 03/15/2023 08:30 AM at Department A14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order) of 12/06/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by: Citizens Business Bank, a California state-chartered bank (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael C. Kelley in Department A15 Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Citizens Business Bank, a California state-chartered bank (Plaintiff); As to: Dr. Sandhu Animal Hospital, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Balpal Sandhu (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Citizens Business Bank, a California state-chartered bank (Plaintiff); As to: Dr. Sandhu Animal Hospital, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Balpal Sandhu (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Citizens Business Bank, a California state-chartered bank (Plaintiff); As to: Dr. Sandhu Animal Hospital, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Balpal Sandhu (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less