This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/27/2022 at 02:07:00 (UTC).

CITIBANK N.A. VS ROBERT SIMONYAN

Case Summary

On 07/26/2022 CITIBANK N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ROBERT SIMONYAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0537

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK N.A.

Defendant

SIMONYAN ROBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEE SUNNY

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/26/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/26/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

7/26/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/26/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/26/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/26/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2022
  • Hearing12/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • Hearing10/06/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by CITIBANK N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by CITIBANK N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by CITIBANK N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEE SUNNY