This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/27/2021 at 02:12:27 (UTC).

CIT BANK, N.A. VS BRIAN HOLDER

Case Summary

On 10/29/2021 CIT BANK, N A filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BRIAN HOLDER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0572

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CIT BANK N.A.

Defendant

HOLDER BRIAN AKA BRIAN L. HOLDER AKA BRIAN LEE HOLDER DBA URBAN CABINETS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RIDER PORTER MARTINA

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/29/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/29/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

10/29/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/29/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/29/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/29/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/1/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2022
  • Hearing03/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department S27 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by CIT BANK, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by CIT BANK, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by CIT BANK, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by CIT BANK, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CIT Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RIDER PORTER MARTINA