This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/07/2023 at 17:09:06 (UTC).

CIRCA 1200, LLC VS VANESSA ARID

Case Summary

On 09/12/2022 CIRCA 1200, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against VANESSA ARID. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STEVEN J. KLEIFIELD and MICHAEL SMALL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9712

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

STEVEN J. KLEIFIELD

MICHAEL SMALL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CIRCA 1200 LLC

Defendant

ARID VANESSA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCOTT RICHARD

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

9/12/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

9/12/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/12/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/12/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/12/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/12/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

9/12/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/14/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

10/12/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/2/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

11/22/2022: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/22/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/18/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

2/8/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

2/22/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION RE ATTORNEY FEES

2/28/2023: Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION RE ATTORNEY FEES

Request for Dismissal

2/28/2023: Request for Dismissal

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2023
  • Hearing03/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 57 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketSupplemental Declaration Supplemental Declaration re attorney fees; Filed by: Circa 1200, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Circa 1200, LLC on 09/12/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Circa 1200, LLC, does Does 1 to 50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Circa 1200, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Vanessa Arid (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 57 - Hon. Michael Smalleffective 02/22/2023; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment scheduled for 03/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 57

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment scheduled for 02/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 57 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 03/23/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment scheduled for 02/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 57

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 57

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Steven J. Kleifield in Department 57 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Circa 1200, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Vanessa Arid (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Circa 1200, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Vanessa Arid (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Circa 1200, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Vanessa Arid (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less