This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/03/2022 at 13:49:35 (UTC).

CIRCA 1200, LLC VS VANESSA ARID

Case Summary

On 09/12/2022 CIRCA 1200, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against VANESSA ARID. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9712

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CIRCA 1200 LLC

Defendant

ARID VANESSA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCOTT RICHARD

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

9/12/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

9/12/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/12/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/12/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/12/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/12/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

9/12/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/14/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

10/12/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/2/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

11/22/2022: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/22/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2023
  • Hearing01/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 57 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: Circa 1200, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Circa 1200, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Vanessa Arid (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketDefault entered as to Vanessa Arid; On the Complaint filed by Circa 1200, LLC on 09/12/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Circa 1200, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Vanessa Arid (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketDefault entered as to Vanessa Arid; On the Complaint filed by Circa 1200, LLC on 09/12/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Circa 1200, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Vanessa Arid (Defendant); Service Date: 10/02/2022; Service Cost: 58.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 57

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Steven J. Kleifield in Department 57 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Circa 1200, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Vanessa Arid (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Circa 1200, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Vanessa Arid (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Circa 1200, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Vanessa Arid (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CIRCA 1200 LLC is a litigant