This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/07/2023 at 00:56:19 (UTC).

CIRCA 1200, LLC VS NAMHEE KWON

Case Summary

On 12/07/2022 CIRCA 1200, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NAMHEE KWON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN P. DOYLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8133

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOHN P. DOYLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CIRCA 1200 LLC

Defendant

KWON NAMHEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCOTT RICHARD

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/7/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/7/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/7/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/7/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

12/7/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

12/7/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

12/7/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/19/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Mail - PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT BY FIRST CLASS MAIL

3/7/2023: Proof of Service by Mail - PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT BY FIRST CLASS MAIL

Case Management Statement

3/7/2023: Case Management Statement

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF R. SCOTT RE: APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION

3/28/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF R. SCOTT RE: APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION

Application for Publication

3/28/2023: Application for Publication

Order for Publication - ORDER FOR PUBLICATION FOR NAMHEE

4/4/2023: Order for Publication - ORDER FOR PUBLICATION FOR NAMHEE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/6/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

6/6/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2023
  • Hearing06/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 78 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 78 - Hon. Jill Feeney; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 78 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 06/07/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • DocketOrder for Publication for Namhee; Signed and Filed by: Circa 1200, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Namhee Kwon (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Order for Publication for Namhee: Filed By: Circa 1200, LLC (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 04/04/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • DocketApplication for Publication; Filed by: Circa 1200, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Namhee Kwon (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • DocketDeclaration Declaration of R. Scott re: Application for Publication; Filed by: Circa 1200, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Circa 1200, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 78

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketAddress for Richard Scott (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Circa 1200, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Namhee Kwon (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Circa 1200, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Namhee Kwon (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Circa 1200, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Namhee Kwon (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Robert S. Draper in Department 78 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less