This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/18/2022 at 03:19:59 (UTC).

CIRCA 1200, LLC VS LORENZO ROBINSON

Case Summary

On 12/13/2021 CIRCA 1200, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against LORENZO ROBINSON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAURICE A. LEITER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5293

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAURICE A. LEITER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CIRCA 1200 LLC

Defendant

ROBINSON LORENZO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARDOSO TANIA KIM

Defendant Attorney

TORRES-FIGUEROA ANDREA

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/14/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/12/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Unknown - VERIFICATION BY LANDLORD REGARDING RENTAL ASSISTANCE

1/12/2022: Unknown - VERIFICATION BY LANDLORD REGARDING RENTAL ASSISTANCE

Proof of Personal Service

1/12/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/12/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

1/13/2022: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/13/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Unknown - VERIFICATION BY LANDLORD REGARDING RENTAL ASSISTANCE

1/13/2022: Unknown - VERIFICATION BY LANDLORD REGARDING RENTAL ASSISTANCE

Answer

1/21/2022: Answer

Answer

1/21/2022: Answer

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

1/24/2022: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT)]

1/24/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT)]

Demand for Jury Trial

1/31/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Application - APPLICATION APPLICATION TO PREVENT FORFEITURE DUE TO COVID-19 RENTAL DEBT

1/31/2022: Application - APPLICATION APPLICATION TO PREVENT FORFEITURE DUE TO COVID-19 RENTAL DEBT

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

1/31/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Answer

1/31/2022: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

1/31/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Substitution of Attorney

2/3/2022: Substitution of Attorney

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2022
  • Hearing05/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 54 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketApplication (Amended -Application to Prevent Forfeiture Due COVID-19 Rental Debt); Filed by Lorenzo Robinson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 54, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Lorenzo Robinson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Lorenzo Robinson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Lorenzo Robinson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Lorenzo Robinson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketVerification by Landlord Regarding Rental Assistance; Filed by Circa 1200, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Lorenzo Robinson)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Circa 1200, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketSupplemental Cover Sheet and Allegations for Unlawful Detainer - Complaint; Filed by Circa 1200, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Circa 1200, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Circa 1200, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Unlawful Detainer (UD); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CIRCA 1200 LLC is a litigant