This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/23/2022 at 12:35:33 (UTC).

CIRCA 1200, LLC VS GABRIEL TRETYAKOU

Case Summary

On 12/13/2021 CIRCA 1200, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against GABRIEL TRETYAKOU. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5290

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CIRCA 1200 LLC

Defendant

TRETYAKOU GABRIEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CARDOSO TANIA KIM

CARDOSO TANIA K.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/16/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

12/16/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/30/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/30/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/30/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

12/30/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Unknown - VERIFICATION BY LANDLORD REGARDING RENTAL ASSISTANCE

12/30/2021: Unknown - VERIFICATION BY LANDLORD REGARDING RENTAL ASSISTANCE

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

3/1/2022: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Unknown - VERIFICATION BY LANDLORD REGARDING RENTAL ASSISTANCE

3/15/2022: Unknown - VERIFICATION BY LANDLORD REGARDING RENTAL ASSISTANCE

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

3/22/2022: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/29/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

4/4/2022: Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Writ of - WRIT OF POSSESSION

4/4/2022: Writ of - WRIT OF POSSESSION

Application for Writ of Possession

4/4/2022: Application for Writ of Possession

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/13/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

12/13/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/13/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Unknown - NOTICE OF ONLINE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ODR) UNLAWFUL DETAINER (UD)

12/13/2021: Unknown - NOTICE OF ONLINE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ODR) UNLAWFUL DETAINER (UD)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession; Filed by Circa 1200, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketJudgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by Circa 1200, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketWrit of (possession); Filed by Circa 1200, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Circa 1200, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketVerification by Landlord Regarding Rental Assistance; Filed by Circa 1200, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Circa 1200, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Gabriel Tretyakou)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketSupplemental Cover Sheet and Allegations for Unlawful Detainer - Complaint; Filed by Circa 1200, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Circa 1200, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Unlawful Detainer (UD); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Circa 1200, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Circa 1200, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CIRCA 1200 LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICES OF HOLLENBECK & CARDOSO, LLP - TANIA CARDOSO