This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/02/2023 at 08:47:34 (UTC).

CIRCA 1200, LLC VS DAPHNE THOMASSINI

Case Summary

On 10/18/2022 CIRCA 1200, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DAPHNE THOMASSINI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3821

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CIRCA 1200 LLC

Defendant

THOMASSINI DAPHNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCOTT RICHARD ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/18/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/18/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/18/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/18/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

10/18/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

10/18/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

10/18/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/31/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Declaration re: Due Diligence

12/16/2022: Declaration re: Due Diligence

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2023
  • Hearing04/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 19 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by: Circa 1200, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Daphne Thomassini (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketAddress for Richard Scott, Esq. (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Stephanie M. Bowick in Department 19 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Circa 1200, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Daphne Thomassini (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Circa 1200, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Daphne Thomassini (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Circa 1200, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Daphne Thomassini (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CIRCA 1200 LLC is a litigant