This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/11/2022 at 18:26:56 (UTC).

CIRCA 1200, LLC VS CHARLES WESSON, II

Case Summary

On 07/18/2022 CIRCA 1200, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CHARLES WESSON, II. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2942

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CIRCA 1200 LLC

Defendant

WESSON II CHARLES AKA CHARLES WESSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCOTT RICHARD

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

7/18/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

7/18/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

7/18/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/18/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/18/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/18/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

7/18/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/20/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Request for Dismissal

7/29/2022: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Circa 1200, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Circa 1200, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Circa 1200, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Circa 1200, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CIRCA 1200 LLC is a litigant