This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/10/2022 at 09:45:47 (UTC).

CIRCA 1200, LLC VS BERNARD MARTINEZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/13/2021 CIRCA 1200, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against BERNARD MARTINEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CURTIS A. KIN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5306

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CURTIS A. KIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CIRCA 1200 LLC

Defendants

MARTINEZ BERNARD

NGOM UMI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARDOSO TANIA KIM

 

Court Documents

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (BERNARD MARTINEZ)

12/14/2021: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (BERNARD MARTINEZ)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

12/14/2021: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (UMI NGOM)

12/14/2021: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (UMI NGOM)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/13/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - SUPPLEMENTAL COVER SHEET AND ALLEGATIONS FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT

12/13/2021: Unknown - SUPPLEMENTAL COVER SHEET AND ALLEGATIONS FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT

Unknown - NOTICE OF ONLINE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ODR) UNLAWFUL DETAINER (UD)

12/13/2021: Unknown - NOTICE OF ONLINE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ODR) UNLAWFUL DETAINER (UD)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/13/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

12/13/2021: Complaint

Request for Dismissal

2/25/2022: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service by Mail

2/25/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

12/29/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/29/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 72, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (as to defendants Bernard Martinez and Umi Ngom) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Circa 1200, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Circa 1200, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Umi Ngom)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Bernard Martinez)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Circa 1200, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Circa 1200, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketSupplemental Cover Sheet and Allegations for Unlawful Detainer - Complaint; Filed by Circa 1200, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Circa 1200, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Unlawful Detainer (UD); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CIRCA 1200 LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICES OF HOLLENBECK & CARDOSO, LLP - TANIA CARDOSO