This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/20/2022 at 12:20:10 (UTC).

CIRCA 1200, LLC VS AMBER BAIRD

Case Summary

On 12/13/2021 CIRCA 1200, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against AMBER BAIRD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MONICA BACHNER. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5295

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MONICA BACHNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CIRCA 1200 LLC

Defendant

BAIRD AMBER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARDOSO TANIA KIM

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/15/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/27/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/27/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/27/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

2/4/2022: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/16/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Unknown - VERIFICATION BY LANDLORD REGARDING RENTAL ASSISTANCE

2/16/2022: Unknown - VERIFICATION BY LANDLORD REGARDING RENTAL ASSISTANCE

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

2/18/2022: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 02/23/2022

2/23/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 02/23/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

2/23/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/11/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Unknown - VERIFICATION BY LANDLORD REGARDING RENTAL ASSISTANCE

3/11/2022: Unknown - VERIFICATION BY LANDLORD REGARDING RENTAL ASSISTANCE

Application for Writ of Possession

3/16/2022: Application for Writ of Possession

Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

3/16/2022: Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Writ of - WRIT OF POSSESSION

3/16/2022: Writ of - WRIT OF POSSESSION

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/13/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

12/13/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/13/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketDefault Judgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by Circa 1200, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketWrit of (possession); Filed by Circa 1200, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession; Filed by Circa 1200, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketVerification by Landlord Regarding Rental Assistance; Filed by Circa 1200, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Circa 1200, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • Docketat 1:53 PM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 02/23/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Circa 1200, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Amber Baird)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Circa 1200, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Circa 1200, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Circa 1200, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketSupplemental Cover Sheet and Allegations for Unlawful Detainer - Complaint; Filed by Circa 1200, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Unlawful Detainer (UD); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CIRCA 1200 LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICES OF HOLLENBECK & CARDOSO, LLP - TANIA CARDOSO