This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/06/2022 at 15:16:23 (UTC).

CIRCA 1200, LLC, ET AL. VS TIER ONE PLUMBING

Case Summary

On 07/01/2022 CIRCA 1200, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TIER ONE PLUMBING. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1529

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CIRCA 1200 LLC

GREYSTAR CALIFORNIA LLC

Defendant

TIER ONE PLUMBING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NESE JONATHAN A.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/5/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

7/1/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

7/1/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/1/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/1/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/1/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

7/1/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Complaint

7/1/2022: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2022
  • Hearing10/31/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 57 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by CIRCA 1200, LLC (Plaintiff); GREYSTAR CALIFORNIA, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by CIRCA 1200, LLC (Plaintiff); GREYSTAR CALIFORNIA, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by CIRCA 1200, LLC (Plaintiff); GREYSTAR CALIFORNIA, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Greystar California Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where CIRCA 1200 LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NESE JONATHAN ALLAN