This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/28/2021 at 00:37:10 (UTC).

CINTHIA RAMOS ANGUIANO VS SPIRIT CLOTHING COMPANY , ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/01/2019 CINTHIA RAMOS ANGUIANO filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against SPIRIT CLOTHING COMPANY . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7181

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAMOS ANGUIANO CINTHIA N.

Defendants

SPIRIT CLOTHING COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

QUINTERO RAMON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

AGNEW KRISTEN MICHELLE

MAGEE HOWARD L.

Defendant Attorney

MIZRAHI JOSHUA

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

1/12/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

1/12/2021: Request for Dismissal

Status Report - STATUS REPORT POST-ARBITRATION

7/20/2020: Status Report - STATUS REPORT POST-ARBITRATION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

7/27/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO SUBMIT ACTION TO ARBITRATION AND TO STAY PROCEEDINGS; [PROPOSED] ORDER

11/12/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO SUBMIT ACTION TO ARBITRATION AND TO STAY PROCEEDINGS; [PROPOSED] ORDER

Case Management Statement

11/18/2019: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

11/27/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 11/27/2019

11/27/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 11/27/2019

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/26/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Personal Service

8/23/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/23/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/1/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

8/1/2019: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/1/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/1/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/1/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/6/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 57; Post-Arbitration Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Cinthia N. Ramos Anguiano (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Cinthia N. Ramos Anguiano (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 57; Post-Arbitration Status Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Post-Arbitration Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketStatus Report (POST-ARBITRATION); Filed by Cinthia N. Ramos Anguiano (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 57; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • Docketat 1:40 PM in Department 57; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 11/27/2019); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Stipulation to Submit Action to Arbitration and to Stay Proceedings; [Proposed] Order); Filed by Spirit Clothing Company, a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • DocketNotice ( of Case Management Conference); Filed by Cinthia N. Ramos Anguiano (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Cinthia N. Ramos Anguiano (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Cinthia N. Ramos Anguiano (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Cinthia N. Ramos Anguiano (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Cinthia N. Ramos Anguiano (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Cinthia N. Ramos Anguiano (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Cinthia N. Ramos Anguiano (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Spirit Clothing Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAGEE, HOWARD L

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Agnew, Kristen M