Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/23/2021 at 14:00:34 (UTC).

CINDY TOLHURST VS MEGUMI NAKAMURA MD ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/02/2017 CINDY TOLHURST filed an Other lawsuit against MEGUMI NAKAMURA MD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are YOLANDA OROZCO, ELAINE LU, STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH and MICHAEL E. WHITAKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2628

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

YOLANDA OROZCO

ELAINE LU

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

MICHAEL E. WHITAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

TOLHURST CINDY

Defendants and Respondents

CEDARS SINIA MEDICAL CENTER INC

NAKAMURA MEGUMI M.D.

DOES 1 TO 50

Other

CARROLL KELLY TROTTER FRANZEN MCBRIDE &

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

SHIRI ROBERT R. ESQ.

SHIRI ROBERT R.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

LYNCH GREGORY G. ESQ.

CARROLL KELLY TROTTER FRANZEN MCBRIDE &

LYNCH GREGORY GORDON ESQ.

LONNER ADAM CARY

CARROLL RICHARD DOUGLAS

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/20/2020

4/20/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/20/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: JUNE 11, 2020)

4/23/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: JUNE 11, 2020)

Notice - NOTICE EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

12/5/2019: Notice - NOTICE EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL DECLARATION IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL AND FSC DATE

1/29/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL DECLARATION IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL AND FSC DATE

Objection - OBJECTION TO EVIDENCE

1/31/2020: Objection - OBJECTION TO EVIDENCE

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DATES

1/31/2020: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DATES

Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION

1/31/2020: Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

2/4/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Objection - OBJECTION EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF HOWARD SIEGEL, M.D.

10/4/2019: Objection - OBJECTION EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF HOWARD SIEGEL, M.D.

Reply - REPLY REPLY TO PLAINTIFF CINDY TOLHURST'S OPPOSITION OF DEFENDANT MEGUMI NAKAMURA, M.D.'S MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT

10/4/2019: Reply - REPLY REPLY TO PLAINTIFF CINDY TOLHURST'S OPPOSITION OF DEFENDANT MEGUMI NAKAMURA, M.D.'S MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Separate Statement

4/12/2019: Separate Statement

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DATES

5/3/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DATES

Notice of Ruling

5/3/2019: Notice of Ruling

ORDER RE:DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

9/13/2018: ORDER RE:DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

Minute Order -

9/13/2018: Minute Order -

Order - Order re Demurrer to and Motion to Strike FAC

11/15/2018: Order - Order re Demurrer to and Motion to Strike FAC

Notice of Ruling

11/20/2018: Notice of Ruling

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

11/7/2018: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

61 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2021
  • Hearing08/25/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • Hearing08/11/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial and All Related Pre-Trial Dates) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial and All Rel...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketEx Parte Application (to Continue Trial and Related Dates); Filed by Megumi M.D. Nakamura (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Jury Trial (- NFC) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
103 More Docket Entries
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by Cedars Sinia Medical Center, Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketJURY DEMAND OF DEFENDANT CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANTS: 1. MEGUMI NAKAMURA, MD 2. CEDARS SINIA MEDICAL CENTER, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR 1 MEDICAL NEGLIGENCE 2 GENERAL NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Cindy Tolhurst (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC652628    Hearing Date: February 21, 2020    Dept: 32

Cindy Tolhurst v. Megumi Nakamura, M.D., et al.

Case No. BC652628

The Court has no tentative order on this motion.  Any party who does not appear in-person or via court call shall waive their right to be heard and shall submit to any decision the Court makes on this motion.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CARROLL KELLY TROTTER FRANZEN & MCKENNA is a litigant

Latest cases where CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHIRI ROBERT R.