This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/22/2022 at 05:46:39 (UTC).

CINDY SMITH, ET AL. VS RED ROBIN INTERNATIONAL, INC., A NEVADA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/30/2022 CINDY SMITH, filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RED ROBIN INTERNATIONAL, INC , A NEVADA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1039

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SMITH CINDY

SMITH EDGAR

Defendants

COVINGTON LISA

RED ROBIN BURGER AND SPIRITS EMPORIUMS AN UNKNOWN LEGAL ENTITY

RED ROBIN INTERNATIONAL INC. A NEVADA CORPORATION DBA RED ROBIN BURGER AND SPIRITS EMPORIUMS

RED ROBIN GOURMET BURGERS INC ALIAS DOE 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOBROSKY DAVID B.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

3/30/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

3/30/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

3/30/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

3/30/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/30/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

3/30/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

3/30/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/30/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/30/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

3/30/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

5/6/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Notice of Settlement

10/21/2022: Notice of Settlement

Notice of Settlement

10/21/2022: Notice of Settlement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 10/25/2022

10/25/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 10/25/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

10/25/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2023
  • Hearing02/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 02/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 10/25/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Final Status Conference scheduled for 09/13/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 10/25/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 10/25/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 03/26/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 10/25/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by: CINDY SMITH (Plaintiff); EDGAR SMITH (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by: CINDY SMITH (Plaintiff); EDGAR SMITH (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: CINDY SMITH (Plaintiff); EDGAR SMITH (Plaintiff); As to: RED ROBIN GOURMET BURGERS, INC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: CINDY SMITH (Plaintiff); EDGAR SMITH (Plaintiff); As to: RED ROBIN INTERNATIONAL, INC., a Nevada Corporation (Defendant); RED ROBIN BURGER AND SPIRITS EMPORIUMS, an Unknown Legal Entity (Defendant); LISA COVINGTON (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CINDY SMITH (Plaintiff); EDGAR SMITH (Plaintiff); As to: RED ROBIN INTERNATIONAL, INC., a Nevada Corporation (Defendant); RED ROBIN BURGER AND SPIRITS EMPORIUMS, an Unknown Legal Entity (Defendant); LISA COVINGTON (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CINDY SMITH (Plaintiff); EDGAR SMITH (Plaintiff); As to: RED ROBIN INTERNATIONAL, INC., a Nevada Corporation (Defendant); RED ROBIN BURGER AND SPIRITS EMPORIUMS, an Unknown Legal Entity (Defendant); LISA COVINGTON (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RED ROBIN INTERNATIONAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOBROSKY DAVID B.