This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/14/2022 at 12:56:45 (UTC).

CINDY MATTA, ET AL. VS 900 NORTH ORANGE GROVE AVENUE, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/22/2020 CINDY MATTA filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against 900 NORTH ORANGE GROVE AVENUE, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTOPHER K. LUI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8990

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HAYES TOMEKA

MATTA CINDY

Defendants

900 NORTH ORANGE GROVE AVENUE LLC

KAUFLER HAROLD

KAUFLER KAREN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

COLE KEVIN JASON

COLE KEVIN J.

SKLAN JEFFREY F.

Defendant Attorneys

SCHWARTZ EDWIN NEAL

CARTER KATHLEEN

SCHWARTZ EDWIN N.

CARTER KATHLEEN MARY

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE;) OF 05/05/2022

5/5/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE;) OF 05/05/2022

Notice of Settlement

5/5/2022: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE;)

5/5/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE;)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF EDWIN SCHWARTZ ISO MOTION TO ENFORCE

4/22/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF EDWIN SCHWARTZ ISO MOTION TO ENFORCE

Motion re: - MOTION RE: TO ENFORCE SUBPOENA FOR PERSONAL RECORDS

4/22/2022: Motion re: - MOTION RE: TO ENFORCE SUBPOENA FOR PERSONAL RECORDS

Separate Statement

4/22/2022: Separate Statement

Motion to Bifurcate

4/29/2022: Motion to Bifurcate

Notice of Mandatory Evaluation Conference

3/17/2022: Notice of Mandatory Evaluation Conference

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: FILING OF JOINT STATEMENT)

3/23/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: FILING OF JOINT STATEMENT)

Notice of Mandatory Evaluation Conference - NOTICE OF MANDATORY EVALUATION CONFERENCE JOINT FILING STATEMENT AND REPORT IN RE SCHEDULING OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE, NO. 2

3/25/2022: Notice of Mandatory Evaluation Conference - NOTICE OF MANDATORY EVALUATION CONFERENCE JOINT FILING STATEMENT AND REPORT IN RE SCHEDULING OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE, NO. 2

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO REMOTE APPEARANCES FO...)

4/7/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO REMOTE APPEARANCES FO...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO REMOTE APPEARANCES FO...) OF 04/07/2022

4/7/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO REMOTE APPEARANCES FO...) OF 04/07/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

3/4/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

8/9/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Substitution of Attorney

5/5/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

5/13/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Order - CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

4/16/2021: Order - CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2022
  • Hearing07/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 76 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 76; Post-Settlement Status Conference ((Post-MSC)) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • Docketat 2:15 PM in Department 76, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case;) of 05/05/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Cindy Matta (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department STL-A; MSC Timeslot (Judge Dalila Corral Lyons)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketMotion to Bifurcate (Plaintiff's Request for Punitive Damages [Res. ID. #3590]); Filed by 900 North Orange Grove Avenue, LLC (Defendant); Harold Kaufler (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (of Edwin Schwartz in support of Motion to Enforce subpoena for personal records); Filed by 900 North Orange Grove Avenue, LLC (Defendant); Harold Kaufler (Defendant); Karen Kaufler (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketMotion to Enforce Subpoena for Personal Records [Res. ID. #2705]; Filed by Harold Kaufler (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by 900 North Orange Grove Avenue, LLC (Defendant); Harold Kaufler (Defendant); Karen Kaufler (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Cindy Matta (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Cindy Matta (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Cindy Matta (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Cindy Matta (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Cindy Matta (Plaintiff); J. M. (Plaintiff); Tomeka Hayes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Cindy Matta (Plaintiff); J. M. (Plaintiff); Tomeka Hayes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Cindy Matta (Plaintiff); J. M. (Plaintiff); Tomeka Hayes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer COLE KEVIN J.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SKLAN JEFFREY F.