This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/06/2021 at 06:59:48 (UTC).

CINDY CAMPBELL VS P AND I TRANSPORTATION, INC.

Case Summary

On 10/06/2020 CINDY CAMPBELL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against P AND I TRANSPORTATION, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8186

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAMPBELL CINDY

Defendant

P AND I TRANSPORTATION INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NAJARIAN ARA JAMES

Defendant Attorney

HONG LYNDON H.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/6/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/6/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/6/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/6/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

10/26/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURE AND HEARING DATES

10/26/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURE AND HEARING DATES

Proof of Personal Service

11/12/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/5/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

1/5/2021: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2023
  • Hearing10/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • Hearing04/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • Hearing03/22/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by P and I Transportation, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by P and I Transportation, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Cindy Campbell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedure and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Cindy Campbell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Cindy Campbell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Cindy Campbell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where P AND I TRANSPORTATION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NAJARIAN ARA JAMES