This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/11/2022 at 12:07:36 (UTC).

CHYON SIMMONS VS DESMOND LINDSEY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/02/2022 CHYON SIMMONS filed a Contract - Business Governance lawsuit against DESMOND LINDSEY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1600

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business Governance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SIMMONS CHYON

Defendants

IRONSTEP CONSTRUCTION AND ENGINEERING LLC

J.P. MORGAN CHASE BANK NA

LINDSEY DESMOND

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

D'ATTARAY MAINAK

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/2/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

5/2/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/2/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/2/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/2/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/2/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

5/2/2022: Complaint

Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon

5/4/2022: Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2022
  • Hearing08/10/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 86 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Chyon Simmons (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Chyon Simmons (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Chyon Simmons (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer D'ATTARAY MAINAK