This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/13/2023 at 15:45:10 (UTC).

CHRISTY BRUCK VS MANUAL ESTRADA

Case Summary

On 01/30/2023 CHRISTY BRUCK filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MANUAL ESTRADA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0410

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRUCK CHRISTY

Defendant

ESTRADA MANUAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREENBLATT FREDRIC

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/30/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/30/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/30/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/30/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

1/30/2023: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/1/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Request for Dismissal

2/9/2023: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/10/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Christy Bruck (Plaintiff); As to: Manual Estrada (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Christy Bruck on 01/30/2023, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Christy Bruck as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Christy Bruck (Plaintiff); As to: Manual Estrada (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Christy Bruck (Plaintiff); As to: Manual Estrada (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Christy Bruck (Plaintiff); As to: Manual Estrada (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Christy Bruck (Plaintiff); As to: Manual Estrada (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Valerie Salkin in Department U Van Nuys Courthouse East

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less