This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/30/2019 at 09:11:36 (UTC).

CHRISTOPHER WILLIAM CRAFT VS AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/08/2018 CHRISTOPHER WILLIAM CRAFT filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9431

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CRAFT CHRISTOPHER WILLIAM

Defendants and Cross Defendants

AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE

RIVERA CARLOS ALEXANDER

JEFFERSON FRANKLIN ALLEN

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

JEFFERSON FRANKLIN ALLEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

AUSTIN TODD MICHAEL

MAKI KEVIN M.

CLINTON DAVID ALLEN

HACK PHILIP L. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

6/8/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

SUMMONS

6/8/2018: SUMMONS

Association of Attorney

3/12/2019: Association of Attorney

Answer

10/9/2018: Answer

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

9/25/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Cross-Complaint

9/24/2018: Cross-Complaint

Summons

9/24/2018: Summons

Answer

9/24/2018: Answer

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

9/17/2018: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

CROSS-COMPLAINT PERSONAL INJURY, PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH

9/17/2018: CROSS-COMPLAINT PERSONAL INJURY, PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH

DEFENDANT AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA'S ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

9/17/2018: DEFENDANT AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA'S ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

Minute Order

9/17/2018: Minute Order

DEFENDANT AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA'S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

9/17/2018: DEFENDANT AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA'S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

9/12/2018: NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by American Medical Response (Legacy Party); Carlos Alexander Rivera (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • DocketCross-Defendant Franklin Allen Jefferson's Answer to Cross-Complaint; Filed by Franklin Allen Jefferson (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Christopher William Craft (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • DocketAnswer FRANKLIN ALLEN JEFFERSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Franklin Allen Jefferson (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Franklin Allen Jefferson (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • DocketCross-Complaint FRANKLIN ALLEN JEFFERSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Franklin Allen Jefferson (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 7; Court Order - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/17/2018
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by American Medical Response (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • DocketCROSS-COMPLAINT PERSONAL INJURY, PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by American Medical Response (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-09-17 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • DocketDEFENDANT AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA'S ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Christopher William Craft (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less