This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/05/2021 at 02:07:59 (UTC).

CHRISTOPHER WATSON VS MAGIC MOUNTAIN, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/23/2020 CHRISTOPHER WATSON filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against MAGIC MOUNTAIN, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CAROLYN B. KUHL. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8184

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CAROLYN B. KUHL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WATSON CHRISTOPHER

Defendant

MAGIC MOUNTAIN LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FRIEDMAN TODD MICHAEL

GROMBACHER KILEY LYNN

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

10/16/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

1/5/2021: Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

Declaration - DECLARATION OF KILEY L. GROMBACHER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL UNDER CALIFORNIA RULE OF COURT 3.770 (A)

10/8/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF KILEY L. GROMBACHER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL UNDER CALIFORNIA RULE OF COURT 3.770 (A)

Substitution of Attorney

8/13/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION)

8/10/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

8/12/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION) OF 08/10/2020

8/10/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION) OF 08/10/2020

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/23/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/23/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/23/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

7/23/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Pleadings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 12, Carolyn B. Kuhl, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 12, Carolyn B. Kuhl, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Order); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketDeclaration of Kiley L. Grombacher in Support of Plaintiff's Request for Voluntary Dismissal Under California Rule of Court 3.770 (a); Filed by Christopher Watson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Kiley Lynn Grombacher (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • Docketat 1:11 PM in Department 12, Carolyn B. Kuhl, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION) of 08/10/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Christopher Watson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Christopher Watson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MAGIC MOUNTAIN LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GROMBACHER KILEY LYNN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FRIEDMAN TODD M.