This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/05/2020 at 04:22:09 (UTC).

CHRISTOPHER VARSOS ET AL VS CITY OF HAWTHORNE ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/28/2018 CHRISTOPHER VARSOS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CITY OF HAWTHORNE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GEORGINA T. RIZK, KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE, MARK C. KIM and MARK A. BORENSTEIN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9725

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GEORGINA T. RIZK

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

MARK C. KIM

MARK A. BORENSTEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Guardian Ad Litems and Petitioners

VARSOS REGINA

VARSOS BREAUNNA

VARSOS TIAROSE

VARSOS CHRISTOPHER

VARSOS MIAH

VARSOS JOSIE

VARSOS SOPHIA

Defendants and Respondents

HEFFNER THOMAS JOHN

HAWTHORNE CITY OF

DOES 1 - 20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

HADDAD JERRY J.

ABOUELSOOD RAMY

ABOUELSOOD RAMY ESQ.

HADDAD JERRY J. ESQ.

ABOUELSOOD RAMY AHMED

Defendant Attorneys

STEVENS BARBARA ALISON

STEVENS BARBARA ALISON ASSISTANT DEPUTY CITY ATTORNEY

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

9/1/2020: Request for Dismissal

Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account

9/2/2020: Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account

Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account

9/2/2020: Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account

Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account

9/2/2020: Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account

Proof of Service by Mail

7/10/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

7/10/2020: Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proc - EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PRO

7/10/2020: Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proc - EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PRO

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MINOR'S COMPROMISE)

7/31/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MINOR'S COMPROMISE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

6/26/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

RETURNED MAIL

3/24/2020: RETURNED MAIL

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/17/2020

3/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/17/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

3/17/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/3/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

RETURNED MAIL

2/13/2020: RETURNED MAIL

Notice of Settlement

1/23/2020: Notice of Settlement

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

1/23/2020: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/10/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

11/25/2019: Case Management Statement

61 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2020
  • Hearing10/07/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department S27 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Order to Show Cause Re: proof of deposit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department S27, Mark C. Kim, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department S27, Mark C. Kim, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (proof of deposit) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketOrder to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account; Filed by Regina Varsos (Plaintiff); TiaRose Varsos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketOrder to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account; Filed by Regina Varsos (Plaintiff); Sophia Varsos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketOrder to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account; Filed by Regina Varsos (Plaintiff); Josie Varsos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Hawthorne, City of (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department S27, Mark C. Kim, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Clerical Error

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department S27, Mark C. Kim, Presiding; Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
104 More Docket Entries
  • 09/24/2018
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Christopher Varsos (Plaintiff); Regina Varsos (Plaintiff); Miah Varsos (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****9725    Hearing Date: November 04, 2019    Dept: 2

AFTER REVIEW OF THE COURT FILE, THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING ORDER:

Department 2 of the Personal Injury Court has determined that the above-entitled action is complicated based upon the number of pretrial hearings and/or the complexity of the issues presented.

AT THE DIRECTION OF DEPARTMENT 1:

This case is hereby transferred and reassigned to the following Independent Calendar Court in the South District, Long Beach, JUDGE M. KIM presiding in Department S-27 for all purposes except trial. Department 1 hereby delegates to the Independent Calendar Court the authority to assign the cause for trial to that Independent Calendar Court.

The Order is signed and filed this date, and incorporated herein by reference. Any pending motions or hearings, including trial and status conferences, will be reset, continued or vacated at the direction of the newly assigned Independent Calendar court.

Upon receipt of this notice, counsel for Plaintiff shall give notice to all parties of record.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HAWTHORNE CITY OF is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ABOUELSOOD RAMY A.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HADDAD JERRY J.