This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/05/2023 at 04:21:54 (UTC).

CHRISTOPHER TAJERIAN VS GLORIA REICH

Case Summary

On 03/04/2021 CHRISTOPHER TAJERIAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GLORIA REICH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JILL FEENEY. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8443

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JILL FEENEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TAJERIAN CHRISTOPHER

Defendant

REICH GLORIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCSROBIAN KRIKOR SARKIS

Defendant Attorney

READER CHAN B.

 

Court Documents

PI General Order

3/19/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

3/19/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

3/4/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Complaint

3/4/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/4/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/4/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Proof of Personal Service

4/2/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/28/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

4/28/2021: Answer

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

8/3/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Substitution of Attorney

7/29/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Request for Dismissal

2/23/2022: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Christopher Tajerian on 03/04/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Christopher Tajerian as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 08/18/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/07/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/07/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 02/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/07/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Christopher Tajerian (Plaintiff); As to: Gloria Reich (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information: As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketAddress for Chan B. Reader (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketAddress for Chan B. Reader (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Chan B. Reader (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketAddress for Krikor Sarkis Mcsrobian (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order]; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 08/18/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 02/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Christopher Tajerian (Plaintiff); As to: Gloria Reich (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Christopher Tajerian (Plaintiff); As to: Gloria Reich (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Christopher Tajerian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Christopher Tajerian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Thomas D. Long in Department 31 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MESROBIAN KRIKOR SARKIS