This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/18/2023 at 03:42:04 (UTC).

CHRISTOPHER T JACKSON, ET AL. VS STROPA INVESTMENTS 2, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/07/2021 CHRISTOPHER T JACKSON, filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against STROPA INVESTMENTS 2, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JILL FEENEY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7387

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JILL FEENEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILLIAMS BARBARA

Defendant

STROPA INVESTMENTS 2 LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KASHANI JONATHAN M ESQ.

MAYO BRIGITTE MARIE ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) CONDITIONAL AS...)

3/15/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) CONDITIONAL AS...)

Status Report

1/17/2023: Status Report

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PROOF OF PURCHASE OF ANNUITIES AS TO ...)

1/17/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PROOF OF PURCHASE OF ANNUITIES AS TO ...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PROOF OF PURCHASE OF ANNUITIES AS TO ...)

12/6/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PROOF OF PURCHASE OF ANNUITIES AS TO ...)

Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

10/31/2022: Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

10/31/2022: Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MINOR'S COMPROMISE; HEARING ON...)

10/31/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MINOR'S COMPROMISE; HEARING ON...)

Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

10/31/2022: Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

10/31/2022: Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

10/31/2022: Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

Notice of Settlement

10/12/2022: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

10/12/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 10/12/2022

10/12/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 10/12/2022

Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

8/15/2022: Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

8/15/2022: Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

8/15/2022: Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

8/15/2022: Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

8/15/2022: Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Christopher T Jackson, et al. on 05/07/2021, entered Order for Dismissal with prejudice as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) Conditional as...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) Conditional as to the Entire Action Filed 10/12/2022 scheduled for 03/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30 updated: Result Date to 03/15/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Proof of Purchase of Annuities as to Three Minors scheduled for 03/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30 updated: Result Date to 03/15/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketStatus Report; Filed by: Christopher T Jackson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) Conditional as to the Entire Action Filed 10/12/2022 scheduled for 03/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Proof of Purchase of Annuities as to Three Minors scheduled for 03/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Proof of Purchase of Annuities as to ...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Order to Show Cause Re: Proof of Purchase of Annuities as to Three Minors scheduled for 01/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 03/15/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) Conditional as to the Entire Action Filed 10/12/2022 scheduled for 01/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 03/15/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
72 More Docket Entries
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Daniel M. Crowley in Department 28 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 10/21/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Christopher T Jackson (Plaintiff); Royal R. Smiler (Plaintiff); Emmett T. Weathersby (Plaintiff); Barbara Williams (Plaintiff); As to: STROPA INVESTMENTS 2, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Christopher T Jackson (Plaintiff); Royal R. Smiler (Plaintiff); Emmett T. Weathersby (Plaintiff); Barbara Williams (Plaintiff); As to: STROPA INVESTMENTS 2, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Christopher T Jackson (Plaintiff); Royal R. Smiler (Plaintiff); Emmett T. Weathersby (Plaintiff); Barbara Williams (Plaintiff); As to: STROPA INVESTMENTS 2, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Emmett: Status Date changed from 05/13/2021 to 05/07/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Royal: Status Date changed from 05/13/2021 to 05/07/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Christopher: Status Date changed from 05/13/2021 to 05/07/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******7387 Hearing Date: October 31, 2022 Dept: 30

Department 30, Spring Street Courthouse
October 31, 2022
*******7387
Petitions to Confirm Minor’s Compromise
DECISION
All three petitions are granted, pending the appearance of the Guardian Ad Litem at the hearing.
The Court finds good cause to excuse the appearance of the minors given their ages and given that the hearing will be held during school hours.
At the hearing, the Court will set an OSC Re: Proof of Purchase of Annuities and Dismissal.
Moving party to provide notice.


Case Number: *******7387 Hearing Date: September 28, 2022 Dept: 30

Department 30, Spring Street Courthouse
September 28, 2022
*******7387
Petition to Approve Compromise of Pending Action of Royal R. Smiler (Age 5), Christopher T. Jackson (Age 15), and Emmett T. Weatherby (Age 3)
DECISION
This matter is continued to permit counsel time to submit the proper version of the forms.
Counsel used outdated versions of forms MC-350 and MC-351 from 2011 and 2010.
The parties are ordered to appear at the hearing to discuss a continued hearing date. Moving party to provide notice.