This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2021 at 16:24:12 (UTC).

CHRISTOPHER SPAIN VS EVELYN CASTILLO ABREGO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/30/2021 CHRISTOPHER SPAIN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against EVELYN CASTILLO ABREGO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6269

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SPAIN CHRISTOPHER

Defendants

ABREGO EVELYN CASTILLO

CUELLAR ALVAREZ MARCO TULIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YEAGER KENNETH C. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/30/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/30/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/30/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2024
  • Hearing09/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • Hearing03/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • Hearing03/16/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Christopher Spain (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Christopher Spain (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Christopher Spain (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer YEAGER KENNETH