Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/17/2021 at 07:21:39 (UTC).

CHRISTOPHER SCOTT HAILE VS CITY OF SANTA CLARITA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/01/2021 CHRISTOPHER SCOTT HAILE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CITY OF SANTA CLARITA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL M. CROWLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3925

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HAILE CHRISTOPHER SCOTT

Defendants

WILLIAMS ANTIONETTE

INSTACART

CITY OF SANTA CLARITA

WOODLANDS MAINTENANCE ASSOCIATION

DAVIS JAMIECE BRIANNA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHANG ALVIN S

Defendant Attorneys

RASHTIAN SIAVASH

BURGER WILLIAM

Other Attorneys

SUBLETTE CAMM

 

Court Documents

Answer

5/12/2021: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

5/5/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

4/21/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT PRIOR TO ALL DEFENDANTS APPEARING IN THIS ACTION

4/8/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT PRIOR TO ALL DEFENDANTS APPEARING IN THIS ACTION

Association of Attorney

4/1/2021: Association of Attorney

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DEMURRING OR MOVING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

3/19/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DEMURRING OR MOVING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

Answer

3/17/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

2/23/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/23/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/23/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

2/23/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

2/23/2021: PI General Order

Proof of Personal Service

2/23/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/23/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Complaint

2/1/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/1/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/1/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/3/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2024
  • Hearing01/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • Hearing08/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • Hearing07/18/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Instacart (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketSummons (on First Amended Complaint); Filed by Christopher Scott Haile (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • Docketat 3:30 PM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Christopher Scott Haile (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (for Plaintiff to File First Amended Complaint Prior to All Defendants Appearing in this Action); Filed by Christopher Scott Haile (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by Christopher Scott Haile (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike (To Complaint;); Filed by Instacart (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Christopher Scott Haile (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Christopher Scott Haile (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Christopher Scott Haile (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Christopher Scott Haile (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Christopher Scott Haile (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Christopher Scott Haile (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Christopher Scott Haile (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Christopher Scott Haile (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WOODLANDS MAINTENANCE ASSOCIATION is a litigant

Latest cases where INSTACART is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF SANTA CLARITA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SUBLETTE CAMM