This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/14/2021 at 00:50:45 (UTC).

CHRISTOPHER SANCHEZ VS SOOD ENTERPRISES, INC

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 CHRISTOPHER SANCHEZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against SOOD ENTERPRISES, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VIRGINIA KEENY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1752

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

VIRGINIA KEENY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANCHEZ CHRISTOPHER

Defendant

SOOD ENTERPRISES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KATOFSKY ALEX PAUL

Defendant Attorneys

TAYLOR BENJAMIN ZACHARY

MARTIROSYAN EDGAR

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

3/25/2021: Case Management Statement

Declaration - DECLARATION OF EVAN S. GAINES IN SUPPORT OF STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT OF CLAIMS AND DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

4/1/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF EVAN S. GAINES IN SUPPORT OF STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT OF CLAIMS AND DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

Case Management Statement

12/8/2020: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/11/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

9/17/2020: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/7/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

6/23/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

5/18/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Substitution of Attorney

6/11/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Case Management Statement

6/12/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/20/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Answer

1/22/2020: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

12/26/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/6/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/6/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/6/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/6/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

12/6/2019: Complaint

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department W, Virginia Keeny, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Entry of Order); Filed by CHRISTOPHER SANCHEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT OF CLAIMS AND DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE); Filed by CHRISTOPHER SANCHEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (OF EVAN S. GAINES IN SUPPORT OF STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT OF CLAIMS AND DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE); Filed by CHRISTOPHER SANCHEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by CHRISTOPHER SANCHEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department W, Virginia Keeny, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by CHRISTOPHER SANCHEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department W, Virginia Keeny, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department W, Virginia Keeny, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by SOOD ENTERPRISES, INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by CHRISTOPHER SANCHEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by CHRISTOPHER SANCHEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by CHRISTOPHER SANCHEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by CHRISTOPHER SANCHEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOOD ENTERPRISES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TAYLOR BENJAMIN ZACHARY

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARTIROSYAN EDGAR