This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/12/2022 at 01:30:51 (UTC).

CHRISTOPHER PERKINS VS OPTUMINSIGHT, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/30/2021 CHRISTOPHER PERKINS filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against OPTUMINSIGHT, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RUPERT A. BYRDSONG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2115

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RUPERT A. BYRDSONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PERKINS CHRISTOPHER

Defendants

OPTUM360 LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

OPTUM360 SERVICES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

OPTUMINSIGHT INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

TESTA TINA MARIE

UNITEDHEALTH GROUP A MINNESOTA CORPORATION

UNITEDHEALTH GROUP INCORPORATED A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PAIRAVI EDWIN

Defendant Attorneys

LYFTOGT MARISSA

PARKER AIMEE

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF HEARING

4/21/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF HEARING

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/18/2022: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Proof of Personal Service

9/17/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/17/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/17/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/17/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/17/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/29/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Answer

10/29/2021: Answer

Case Management Statement

12/2/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

12/2/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

12/20/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANT TINA TESTAS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

1/13/2022: Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANT TINA TESTAS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

1/13/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

1/21/2022: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

1/21/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/25/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF HEARING

1/26/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF HEARING

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2022
  • Hearing07/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Rupert A. Byrdsong, Presiding; Status Conference (ReRemoval of Case to Federal Court) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketNotice (of Hearing); Filed by Christopher Perkins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketNotice (of Hearing); Filed by Christopher Perkins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Rupert A. Byrdsong, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Optuminsight, Inc., a Delaware Corporation (Defendant); Optum360, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Optum360 Services, Inc., a Delaware Corporation (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by Optuminsight, Inc., a Delaware Corporation (Defendant); Optum360, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Optum360 Services, Inc., a Delaware Corporation (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketAnswer (DEFENDANT TINA TESTA?S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT); Filed by Tina Marie Testa (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Christopher Perkins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Christopher Perkins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Christopher Perkins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Christopher Perkins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Christopher Perkins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Christopher Perkins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Christopher Perkins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Christopher Perkins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OPTUM360 SERVICES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Optuminsight, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where UNITEDHEALTH GROUP INC. DBA OPTUM is a litigant