This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/15/2022 at 21:36:22 (UTC).

CHRISTOPHER KADDAS, AN INDIVIDUAL VS UNIVERSAL CITY STUDIOS LLC, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/20/2021 CHRISTOPHER KADDAS, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against UNIVERSAL CITY STUDIOS LLC, A DELAWARE CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0898

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KADDAS AN INDIVIDUAL CHRISTOPHER

Defendants

AN INDIVIDUAL TED

NBC UNIVERSAL THEME PARKS UNKNOWN ENTITY

UNIVERSAL CITY STUDIOS LLC A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROMERO VANESSA M. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

SCHRIEFFER PAUL K

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/20/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/20/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/20/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/20/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

9/7/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

9/7/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Proof of Personal Service

2/2/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/2/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

3/16/2022: Answer

Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

8/4/2022: Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2024
  • Hearing08/16/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • Hearing02/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • Hearing02/03/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) scheduled for 08/25/2022 at 11:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 08/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketInformal Discovery Conference (IDC) scheduled for 08/25/2022 at 11:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketInformal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts; Filed by: UNIVERSAL CITY STUDIOS LLC, A DELAWARE CORPORATION (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: UNIVERSAL CITY STUDIOS LLC, A DELAWARE CORPORATION (Defendant); As to: CHRISTOPHER KADDAS, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: CHRISTOPHER KADDAS, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); As to: UNIVERSAL CITY STUDIOS LLC, A DELAWARE CORPORATION (Defendant); Service Date: 01/27/2022; Service Cost: 124.15; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: CHRISTOPHER KADDAS, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); As to: NBC UNIVERSAL THEME PARKS, UNKNOWN ENTITY (Defendant); Service Date: 01/27/2022; Service Cost: 69.15; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 02/03/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 08/16/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: CHRISTOPHER KADDAS, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); As to: UNIVERSAL CITY STUDIOS LLC, A DELAWARE CORPORATION (Defendant); NBC UNIVERSAL THEME PARKS, UNKNOWN ENTITY (Defendant); TED AN INDIVIDUAL (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CHRISTOPHER KADDAS, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); As to: UNIVERSAL CITY STUDIOS LLC, A DELAWARE CORPORATION (Defendant); NBC UNIVERSAL THEME PARKS, UNKNOWN ENTITY (Defendant); TED AN INDIVIDUAL (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CHRISTOPHER KADDAS, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); As to: UNIVERSAL CITY STUDIOS LLC, A DELAWARE CORPORATION (Defendant); NBC UNIVERSAL THEME PARKS, UNKNOWN ENTITY (Defendant); TED AN INDIVIDUAL (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 29 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Universal City Studios Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROMERO, VANESSA M