This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/17/2021 at 21:14:25 (UTC).

CHRISTOPHER K. TINER VS PREMIERE PLASTIC SURGERY, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/10/2020 CHRISTOPHER K TINER filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PREMIERE PLASTIC SURGERY, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BARBARA A. MEIERS, JON R. TAKASUGI and JAMES R. DUNN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0140

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

BARBARA A. MEIERS

JON R. TAKASUGI

JAMES R. DUNN

 

Party Details

Cross Defendants and Plaintiffs

TINER CHRISTOPHER K.

PREMIERE PLASTIC SURGERY INC.

NAMCO ENTERPRISES INC.

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

TUCKER NICHOLAS

BENTLEY & MORE LLP A LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP

PREMIERE PLASTIC SURGERY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

PREMIERE PLASTIC SURGERY INC.

NAMCO ENTERPRISES INC.

BENTLEY & MORE LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorney

CAPAZZOLA DAMIAN

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

MAMONE NICO

RYAN PETER J

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

RYAN PETER J

CAPAZZOLA DAMIAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2022
  • Hearing12/05/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 17 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • Hearing11/17/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 17 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • Hearing09/30/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 17 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Joint Stipulation and [proposed] Order Re First Amended Cross-complaint Of Bentley More Llp and Nicholas Tucker); Filed by Christopher K. Tiner (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 17, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 17, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 17, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Case Management Conference ((Further)) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 17, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 17, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 17, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Protective Order - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
92 More Docket Entries
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Christopher K. Tiner (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • Docketat 09:25 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Christopher K. Tiner (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 08/13/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Christopher K. Tiner (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Christopher K. Tiner (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Christopher K. Tiner (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20STCV30140    Hearing Date: March 19, 2021    Dept: 17

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

DEPARTMENT 17

TENTATIVE RULING

CHRISTOPHER K. TINER

vs.

PREMIERE PLASTIC SURGERY, INC, et al.

Case No.: 20STCV30140

Hearing Date: March 19, 2021

Cross-Defendants’ demurrer to the original Cross-Complaint is MOOT.

On 8/10/2020, Plaintiff Christopher K. Tiner filed suit against Defendants Premiere Plastic Surgery, Inc., Bentley & More LLP, and Nicholas Tucker. On 10/22/2020, Plaintiff filed a first amended complaint (FAC) alleging: (1) breach of written contract; (2) conversion; (3) constructive trust; (4) common count; money had and received; (5) common count; and (6) declaratory relief.

On 12/4/2020, Nicolas Tucker and Bentley & More LLP (collectively, Cross-Defendants) filed a cross-complaint against Christopher K. Tiner, Premiere Plastic Surgery, and Namco Enterprises (collectively, Cross-Complainants, alleging: (1) fraud in the inducement; (2) unfair competition; (3) fraud; (4) implied equitable indemnity; and (5) equitable contribution.

On 1/4/2021, Cross-Defendant Tiner filed a demurrer to Cross-Complainant’s Cross-Complaint.

However, on 3/8/2021, Cross-Complainants filed a first amended Cross-Complainant (FAXC). Accordingly, Cross-Defendant Tiner’s demurrer is raised against a non-operative Cross-Complaint, and thus is moot.

It is so ordered.

Dated: March , 2021

Hon. Jon R. Takasugi Judge of the Superior Court

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at smcdept17@lacourt.org by 4 p.m. the day prior as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative. If all parties to a motion submit, the court will adopt this tentative as the final order. If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar.

Due to Covid-19, the court is strongly discouraging in-person appearances. Parties, counsel, and court reporters present are subject to temperature checks and health inquiries, and will be denied entry if admission could create a public health risk. The court encourages the parties wishing to argue to appear via L.A. Court Connect. For more information, please contact the court clerk at (213) 633-0517. Your understanding during these difficult times is appreciated.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PREMIERE PLASTICE SURGERY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CAPAZZOLA DAMIAN