This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/25/2021 at 15:09:26 (UTC).

CHRISTOPHER JOHN MOONEY VS THE HERTZ CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/18/2021 CHRISTOPHER JOHN MOONEY filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against THE HERTZ CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2440

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOONEY CHRISTOPHER JOHN

Defendants

HERTZ VEHICLES LLC

KORAT PUNAM HITESH

THE HERTZ CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANDELL LAURENCE H

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/18/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/18/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/18/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/18/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

12/6/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

12/6/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Proof of Personal Service

12/1/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/1/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

11/19/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2024
  • Hearing11/14/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • Hearing05/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • Hearing05/04/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Christopher John Mooney (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Christopher John Mooney (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Christopher John Mooney (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Christopher John Mooney (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Christopher John Mooney (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Christopher John Mooney (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HERTZ VEHICLES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where The Hertz Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MANDELL LAURENCE H. ESQ.