This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/20/2021 at 01:34:48 (UTC).

CHRISTOPHER GUTIERREZ VS HYPERLOUNGE LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/04/2019 CHRISTOPHER GUTIERREZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against HYPERLOUNGE LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GREGORY W. ALARCON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9379

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GREGORY W. ALARCON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GUTIERREZ CHRISTOPHER

Defendants

MICHAELS MURPHY AN INDIVIDUAL

HYPERLOUNGE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

REISNER ADAM JASON

KSADZHIKYAN VIRGINIA G.

JONES MICHAEL WESLEY

GRIMBERG NIRAN

Defendant Attorneys

SLADE LAWRENCE P

COHEN MARTHA LEE

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/8/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE (1) TRIAL DATE; (2) FSC; AND (3) RELATED LITIGATION DATES

2/9/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE (1) TRIAL DATE; (2) FSC; AND (3) RELATED LITIGATION DATES

Order - ORDER ON STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE

12/16/2020: Order - ORDER ON STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

9/17/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

12/6/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE MATTER IS CALLED FOR HEARING.)

10/21/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE MATTER IS CALLED FOR HEARING.)

Case Management Statement

9/23/2019: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

10/8/2019: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/8/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

7/22/2019: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/10/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/11/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

6/7/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE

6/6/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/4/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/4/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/4/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

6/4/2019: Complaint

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2021
  • Hearing04/20/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 36 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • Hearing04/13/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 36 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 36, Gregory W. Alarcon, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (TO CONTINUE (1) TRIAL DATE; (2) FSC; AND (3) RELATED LITIGATION DATES); Filed by Christopher Gutierrez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Christopher Gutierrez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketOrder (on stipulation to Continue Trial Date)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketStipulation - No Order (to Continue Trial Date); Filed by HYPERLOUNGE LLC (Defendant); MURPHY MICHAELS, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 36, Gregory W. Alarcon, Presiding; Jury Trial - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 36, Gregory W. Alarcon, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by HYPERLOUNGE LLC (Defendant); MURPHY MICHAELS, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by HYPERLOUNGE LLC (Defendant); MURPHY MICHAELS, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Christopher Gutierrez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Christopher Gutierrez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketDeclaration ( IN SUPPORT OF PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE); Filed by Christopher Gutierrez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Christopher Gutierrez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Christopher Gutierrez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Christopher Gutierrez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KSADZHIKYAN VIRGINIA G.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JONES, MICHAEL W.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GRIMBERG NIRAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REISNER ADAM ESQ.