This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/29/2019 at 01:43:21 (UTC).

CHRISTOPHER DOYLE JACOBS VS 1114 GROUP LLC

Case Summary

On 04/11/2018 a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury case was filed by CHRISTOPHER DOYLE JACOBS against 1114 GROUP LLC in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1660

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

JACOBS CHRISTOPHER DOYLE

Defendants and Respondents

THE HUDSON

1114 GROUP LLC

DOES 1 TO 25

HUDSON THE

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

5/29/2018: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

CIVIL DEPOSIT

5/29/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES

5/29/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES

Summons on Cross Complaint

5/29/2018: Summons on Cross Complaint

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

5/29/2018: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR EQUITABLE INDEMNITY; APPORTIONMENT OF FAULT; AND EXPRESS INDEMNITY

5/29/2018: CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR EQUITABLE INDEMNITY; APPORTIONMENT OF FAULT; AND EXPRESS INDEMNITY

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

6/1/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOTICE OF RULING RE MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT

6/28/2018: NOTICE OF RULING RE MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT

DECLARATION OF JAMES P. HART, JR. RE: MEET & CONFER RE: MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT

7/16/2018: DECLARATION OF JAMES P. HART, JR. RE: MEET & CONFER RE: MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE COMPLAINT

7/25/2018: [TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE COMPLAINT

Minute Order

7/25/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

10/30/2018: Minute Order

Notice of Ruling

11/30/2018: Notice of Ruling

Certificate of Mailing for

4/24/2019: Certificate of Mailing for

Notice of Related Case

4/24/2019: Notice of Related Case

Minute Order

4/24/2019: Minute Order

Notice of Ruling

5/30/2019: Notice of Ruling

SUMMONS

4/11/2018: SUMMONS

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by 1114 Group, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • at 10:56 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) of 04/24/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • Notice of Related Case; Filed by 1114 Group, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Court Order: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by 1114 Group, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by 1114 Group, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Strike ((Legacy)) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • Order (Defendant's Motion To Strike Portions of the Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • Minute Order ((Legacy Event Type : Motion to Strike)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 05/29/2018
  • Answer; Filed by 1114 Group, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR EQUITABLE INDEMNITY; APPORTIONMENT OF FAULT; AND EXPRESS INDEMNITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • Summons; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • Cross-Complaint; Filed by 1114 Group, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • Notice; Filed by 1114 Group, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1. ASSAULT AND BATTERY; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Christopher Doyle Jacobs (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC701660    Hearing Date: January 13, 2020    Dept: 5

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 5

Christopher doyle jacobs,

Plaintiff,

v.

1114 group, llc, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: BC701660

Hearing Date: January 13, 2020

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

motions to compel discovery responses

Defendant 1114 Group, LLC (“Defendant”) moves to compel responses from Plaintiff Christopher Doyle Jacobs (“Plaintiff”) to: (1) Request for Production of Documents, Set One (“RPD”); and (2) Form Interrogatories, Set One (“FROG”). Defendant served the discovery requests by mail on May 29, 2019. Plaintiff’s responses were thus due no later than July 3, 2019. As of the filing date of these motions, Defendant has not received responses from Plaintiff. Accordingly, the motions to compel responses to the RPD and FROG are granted per Code of Civil Procedure sections 2030.290 and 2031.300. Plaintiff is ordered to serve responses to Defendant’s RPD and FROG, without objections, within 30 days of service of this order.

Defendant seeks sanctions in connection with the motions. The Court concludes that Plaintiff’s failure to respond to the discovery is an abuse of the discovery process. The Court awards sanctions against Plaintiff and his attorney of record, Brian Hurwitz, in the amount of $780, which represents four hours of attorney time at a rate of $165 per hour, plus two filing fees of $60 each.

CONCLUSION AND ORDER

Defendant’s motions to compel responses to the RPD and FROG are granted per Code of Civil Procedure sections 2030.290 and 2031.300. Plaintiff is ordered to serve verified responses, without objections, within 30 days of notice of this order.

Plaintiff and his attorney of record, Brian Hurwitz, jointly and severally, are ordered to pay monetary sanctions in the amount of $780 to Defendant, by and through counsel, within 30 days of notice of this order.

Defendant is ordered to provide notice of this order and file proof of service of such.

DATED: January 13, 2020 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court