This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2021 at 04:22:46 (UTC).

CHRISTOPHER DOBBERT VS CITY OF CLAREMONT, A GOVERNMENT ENTITY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/30/2021 CHRISTOPHER DOBBERT filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF CLAREMONT, A GOVERNMENT ENTITY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8336

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOBBERT CHRISTOPHER

Defendants

AMERICAN STATES WATER COMPANY A CORPORATION

CHRISTENSEN BROTHERS GENERAL ENGINERRING INC. A CORPORATION

CITY OF CLAREMONT A GOVERNMENT ENTITY

CITY OF POMONA A GOVERNMENT ENTITY

GOLDEN STATE WATER COMPANY INC. A CORPORATION

NULINE TECHNOLOGIES INC. A CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BELTY ANGELA M ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/2/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/2/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/30/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

PI General Order

8/10/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

8/10/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2024
  • Hearing07/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • Hearing01/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • Hearing01/13/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by CHRISTOPHER DOBBERT (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by CHRISTOPHER DOBBERT (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CHRISTENSEN BROTHERS GENERAL ENGINEERING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF CLAREMONT is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN STATES WATER COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where GOLDEN STATE WATER COMPANY is a litigant