This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/22/2022 at 03:36:30 (UTC).

CHRISTOPHER CLARKE, ET AL. VS AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/18/2019 CHRISTOPHER CLARKE filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against AIR LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5332

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CLARKE CHRISTOPHER

Defendants

AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION

CBS CORPORATION FKA VIACOM INC. SUED AS SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION FKA WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

THE GORMAN-RUPP COMPANY

WARREN PUMPS LLC

TATE ANDALE INC.

TRANE US INC. FKA AMERICAN STANDARD COMPANIES SUED AS SUCCESSOR TO KEWANEE BOILER COMPANY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO ROSS HEATER AND MANUFACTURING CO. INC.

BW / IP INTERNATIONAL INC.

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

AURORA PUMP COMPANY

ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL INC.

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. FKA ALLIED-SIGNAL INC.

CROSBY VALVE INC.

THOMAS DEE ENGINEERING CO. INC.

THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY

THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY

IMO INDUSTRIES INC.

HOPEMAN BROTHERS INC.

WEIR VALVES & CONTROLS USA INC. FKA ATWOOD & MORRILL

CLA-VAL CO.

15 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PURDY STUART

Defendant Attorneys

PRINDLE KENNETH B.

WOOD CHRISTOPHER W.

AMEELE KEITH M.

GOLDBERG KAREN BRO

FOLEY PATRICK JAMES

BAILEY BOBBIE RAE

HAKE WILLIAM M.

KRAFT ROBERT S.

NICHOLS STEPHEN MATTHEW

O'DONNELL ALYSSA D.

PETROVSKY LISA M.

DUFFY JOSEPH

LISTER JOHN R.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

8/31/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/18/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (SIMON GREENSTONE PANATIER, P.C.); STATUS C...)

3/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (SIMON GREENSTONE PANATIER, P.C.); STATUS C...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

3/17/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

1/12/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

12/7/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSURE (CLARKE-19STCV...)

7/13/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSURE (CLARKE-19STCV...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/23/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

4/23/2020: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

2/26/2020: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

2/26/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE TO VENDOR

1/8/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE TO VENDOR

Proof of Personal Service

1/8/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/8/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/8/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/8/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/8/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/8/2020: Proof of Personal Service

69 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • Docketat 1:45 PM in Department 15; Status Conference ((Simon Greenstone Panatier, P.C.)) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference (Simon Greenstone Panatier, P.C.); Status C...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • Docketat 1:45 PM in Department 15; Status Conference ((Simon Greenstone Panatier)) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • Docketat 1:45 PM in Department 15; Order to Show Cause Re: (Administrative Closure (Clarke-19STCV45332)) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
67 More Docket Entries
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Christopher Clarke (Plaintiff); Cheryl Clarke (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Goulds Pumps LLC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by ITT Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 12/30/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Syd Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Christopher Clarke (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Christopher Clarke (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TATE ANDALE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CROSBY VALVE LLC (DOE 5) is a litigant

Latest cases where THOMAS DEE ENGINERRING COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL INC. is a litigant