This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/19/2019 at 08:08:51 (UTC).

CHRISTOPHER BEMBYNISTA VS PAUL G. DOMBROWSKI

Case Summary

On 11/19/2018 CHRISTOPHER BEMBYNISTA filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against PAUL G DOMBROWSKI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DEIRDRE HILL. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0112

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DEIRDRE HILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BEMBYNISTA CHRISTOPHER

Defendant

DOMBROWSKI PAUL G.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHAH ANITA V

Defendant Attorney

DOHERTY JOHN JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AS TO ENTIRE ACTION

11/26/2019: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AS TO ENTIRE ACTION

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

10/17/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JOHN DOHERTY RE: FAILURE TO APPEAR

10/9/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JOHN DOHERTY RE: FAILURE TO APPEAR

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: SETTLEMENT ATTEMPT) OF 08/12/2019

8/12/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: SETTLEMENT ATTEMPT) OF 08/12/2019

Substitution of Attorney

4/19/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Notice of Ruling

4/5/2019: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Deposit - Jury

4/3/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

Proof of Service by Mail

3/25/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Case Management Statement

3/25/2019: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

3/26/2019: Case Management Statement

Declaration - Declaration Re Meet&Confer

2/1/2019: Declaration - Declaration Re Meet&Confer

Demand for Jury Trial

2/1/2019: Demand for Jury Trial

Summons - Summons on amended complaint

11/29/2018: Summons - Summons on amended complaint

Proof of Personal Service

12/13/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

12/21/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Complaint - Complaint for damages

11/19/2018: Complaint - Complaint for damages

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/19/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/19/2018: Notice of Case Management Conference

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (as to Entire Action); Filed by Christopher Bembynista (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketNotice of Court Order Re: Settlement and Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal; Filed by Christopher Bembynista (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Status Conference (resettlement attempt) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Order to Show Cause Re: (sanctions for defendant's counsel failure to appear and failure to participate in settlement efforts) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • Docketat 3:21 PM in Department B; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Notice of Settlement) of 10/09/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of John Doherty Re: Failure to Appear); Filed by Paul G. Dombrowski (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: Notice of Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Christopher Bembynista (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 12/21/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Christopher Bembynista (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • DocketSummons (on amended complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Christopher Bembynista (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketComplaint (Amended Complaint for Damges); Filed by Christopher Bembynista (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketComplaint (for damages); Filed by Christopher Bembynista (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DOHERTY JOHN JOSEPH