This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/07/2021 at 23:00:53 (UTC).

CHRISTOPHER BARRAGAN VS COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/17/2018 CHRISTOPHER BARRAGAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ELAINE LU, STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH and TERESA A. BEAUDET. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0275

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ELAINE LU

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

TERESA A. BEAUDET

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

BARRAGAN CHRISTOPHER

Defendants and Respondents

J. WALSH CONSTRUCTION INC.

LOS ANGELES COUNTY OF

J.F. SHEA CONSTRUCTION MANAGEMENT INC.

J.F. SHEA CONSTRUCTION INC.

EFCO CORP.

THE WALSH GROUP INC.

DOES 1-100 INCLUSIVE

WALSH CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN

J.F. SHEA CONSTRUCTION INC

EFCO CORP. - SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Other

HINSHAW & CULBERTSON LAW OFFICES OF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

BORDIN-WOSK JOSHUA ESQ.

BLOOM MARK J. ESQ.

B|B LAW GROUP LLP

GHYCZY DANIEL CHRISTOPHER

BLOOM MARK JAY ASHLEY

BORDIN-WOSK JOSHUA D ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

COLEMAN JOHN M. ESQ.

STERMITZ MARK L.

SCHAFER MELLISSA ANN

HUBERT ANDREW C.

STERMITZ MARK LAWRENCE

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES)

7/12/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES)

Declaration - DECLARATION COMPENDIUM OF EVIDENCE LODGED IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITYS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR, IN THE ALTER

6/17/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION COMPENDIUM OF EVIDENCE LODGED IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITYS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR, IN THE ALTER

Separate Statement

6/17/2021: Separate Statement

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITYS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE

6/17/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITYS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE

Proof of Personal Service

6/25/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/25/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITYS REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

6/25/2021: Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITYS REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

Separate Statement

6/25/2021: Separate Statement

Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING MOTIONS TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES OFF CALENDAR

6/29/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING MOTIONS TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES OFF CALENDAR

Objection - OBJECTION PLAINTIFFS OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITYS RESPONSE TO SEPARATE STATEMENT

6/30/2021: Objection - OBJECTION PLAINTIFFS OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITYS RESPONSE TO SEPARATE STATEMENT

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE ERMELINDA HERNANDEZ, CSR #12257

7/1/2021: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE ERMELINDA HERNANDEZ, CSR #12257

Order - ORDER RE: DEFENDANT LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

7/1/2021: Order - ORDER RE: DEFENDANT LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)

7/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)

Notice - NOTICE OF RULING RE: DEFENDANT LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITYS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

7/2/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF RULING RE: DEFENDANT LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITYS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Informal Discovery Conference

5/17/2021: Informal Discovery Conference

Informal Discovery Conference

5/28/2021: Informal Discovery Conference

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

5/11/2021: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

5/11/2021: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

130 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2021
  • Hearing09/01/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • Hearing08/25/2021 at 11:00 AM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • Hearing08/20/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • Hearing08/13/2021 at 4:00 PM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketNotice (OF RULING RE: DEFENDANT LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITYS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION); Filed by Christopher Barragan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
244 More Docket Entries
  • 05/09/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by EFCO Corp. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Christopher Barragan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Christopher Barragan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Christopher Barragan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet /Coversheet Addendum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Christopher Barragan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC690275    Hearing Date: January 12, 2021    Dept: 50

 

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 50

christopher barragan,

Plaintiff,

vs.

los angeles county metropolitan transportation authority, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.:

BC 690275

Hearing Date:

January 12, 2021

Hearing Time:

10:00 a.m.

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE:

PLAINTIFF CHRISTOPHER BARRAGAN’S MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE

Background

Plaintiff Christopher Barragan (“Barragan”) filed this personal injury action on January 17, 2018 against Defendant Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (“LACMTA”).

Barragan now moves for an order granting trial preference under Code of Civil Procedure section 36, subdivision (e). Trial in this matter is currently set for May 5, 2021. LACMTA opposes.

Discussion

Code of Civil Procedure section 36, subdivision (e) provides:

According to counsel for Barragan, during the past ninety days (counting from November 30, 2020), Barragan has had noticeable and severe difficulty recalling basic events and completely loses track of conversations mid-stream. (Ghyczy Decl., ¶ 4.) Counsel for Barragan states that these problems have begun to appear more frequently and in worsening severity, making it increasingly difficult for counsel to communicate with Barragan. (Ghyczy Decl., ¶ 4.) Counsel for Barragan asserts that it is foreseeable that Barragan will not be able to adequately prosecute this action due to his inability to assist counsel in preparation for trial. (Ghyczy Decl., ¶ 5.) Barragan thus contends that the interests of justice will be served by granting him preference.

LACMTA contends that Barragan has not provided adequate evidentiary basis for why a trial preference is necessary. LACMTA argues that a trial preference would severely prejudice LACMTA by depriving it of its due process rights to complete necessary expert discovery and trial preparations. LACMTA notes that Barragan has already been deposed five times between 2017 and 2020, and his latest deposition completed on March 4, 2020. Moreover, LACMTA has medical and mental examinations scheduled for Barragan on January 11, 13, and 18 of 2021. LACMTA contends that an expedited trial date will not permit it to complete discovery in this matter. In reply, Barragan notes that if trial preference is granted, trial must be set no later than May 12, 2021, and currently, trial is set for May 5, 2021. In light of that fact, the Court is not inclined to grant trial preference. The parties have represented that they are diligently pursuing discovery and that much discovery has already been completed. Therefore, the Court does not find that the interests of justice would be served by gpranting a trial preference in light of the set trial date.

Conclusion

Based on the foregoing, Barragan’s motion for trial preference is denied.

LACMTA is ordered to give notice of this Order.

DATED: January 12, 2021 ________________________________

Hon. Teresa A. Beaudet

Judge, Los Angeles Superior Court

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where J.F. SHEA CONSTRUCTION MANAGEMENT INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where THE WALSH GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where EFCO CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where HINSHAW & CULBERTSON LAW OFFICES OF is a litigant